IL SB3224 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Contains provisions requiring alternative fuel supplier licenses. Provides that licensed distributors, suppliers, and receivers are not considered blenders under the Act. Provides that the term "blender" includes persons who engage in the business of selling motor fuel at retail and not for resale that is blended by purchasers through the use of blender pumps. Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that prepayment provisions do not apply to alternative fuel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MOTOR FUEL-ALTERNATIVE FUEL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351202dAmended CodeCitation Text
355051.1Amended CodeCitation Text
355051.14Amended CodeCitation Text
355051.2Amended CodeCitation Text
355051.20Amended CodeCitation Text
355051.30New CodeSee Bill Text
355051.3aNew CodeSee Bill Text
355051.6Amended CodeCitation Text
3550512Amended CodeCitation Text
3550512aAmended CodeCitation Text
3550513Amended CodeCitation Text
3550515Amended CodeCitation Text
3550516Amended CodeCitation Text
355053Amended CodeCitation Text
355053dNew CodeSee Bill Text
355053eNew CodeSee Bill Text
355053fNew CodeSee Bill Text
355053gNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback