IL SB3224 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Contains provisions requiring alternative fuel supplier licenses. Provides that licensed distributors, suppliers, and receivers are not considered blenders under the Act. Provides that the term "blender" includes persons who engage in the business of selling motor fuel at retail and not for resale that is blended by purchasers through the use of blender pumps. Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that prepayment provisions do not apply to alternative fuel.
Title
MOTOR FUEL-ALTERNATIVE FUEL
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 120 | 2d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 1.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 1.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 1.30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 1.3a | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 1.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 12a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 3d | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 3e | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 3f | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 3g | New Code | See Bill Text |