IL SB3223 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Child Death Review Team Act by repealing provisions permitting the Child Death Review Teams Executive Council to establish in the Southern Region of the State a special Child Death Investigation Task Force. Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall establish a Child Death Investigation Task Force to operate in the Southern Region of the State and in other regions at the discretion of the Director of the Department. Requires the Task Force to develop and implement a plan for the investigation of sudden, unexpected, or unexplained child fatalities or near fatalities of children under 18 years of age occurring within that region. Requires the Task Force's plan to include provisions for local or State law enforcement agencies and other specified entities to promptly notify the Task Force of a sudden, unexpected, or unexplained child fatality or near fatality of a child, and for the Task Force to review and investigate the notification. Requires the investigation to include coordination among members of a multidisciplinary team. Provides for appointment of a Board of Directors to govern the Task Force. Provides for State indemnification of the Task Force and the Board of Directors, except for willful or wanton misconduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-CHILD DEATH INVESTIGATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-001-000
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2051545Repealed CodeCitation Text
325511.9New CodeSee Bill Text
32553Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback