IL SB3220 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends an Article of the School Code concerning educator licensure. Provides that the State Board of Education shall not approve a course of study under the Alternative Educator Licensure Program for Teachers unless the State Board can demonstrate that there is a need for a particular type of licensed educator offered by the course of study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-ALT TEACHER LICENSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 054-001-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 4 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 4
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-008-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-001-000
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-003-000
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 011-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-50Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3220&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3220.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3220eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3220enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3220sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3220sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3220ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3220ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3220ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3220ham004.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3220_04242018_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3220_05282018_021000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3220ham004_05312018_022000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback