IL SB3216 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Adds a licensed physical therapist as a person who can verify that a person is a person with disabilities for the purposes of the Code.
Title
VEH-CD-PHYSICAL THERAPISTS
Sponsors
Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Michael Kelly [D] | Rep. Jeff Keicher [R] |
Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1011 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 009-000-000 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-159.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |