IL SB3215 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning sales in error, provides that, in cases where improvements upon the property sold have been substantially destroyed or rendered uninhabitable or otherwise unfit for occupancy, the court may order the holder of the certificate of purchase to assign the certificate to the county collector, upon request of the county collector. Provides that the county collector may further assign the certificate to the county, acting as trustee for taxing districts, or to a taxing district having an interest in the taxes sold. Provides that, if the certificate of purchase is assigned to the county delinquent tax agent because the improvements have been substantially destroyed or rendered uninhabitable or otherwise unfit for occupancy, then the county delinquent tax agent shall extend the redemption period by 36 months.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SALE IN ERROR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-02HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Barickman
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Revenue; 006-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520021-310Amended CodeCitation Text
3520021-385Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback