IL SB3214 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Pollinator Friendly Solar Site Act. Provides that an owner of a ground-mounted solar site may follow practices that: (1) provide native perennial vegetation and foraging habitat which is beneficial to game birds, songbirds, and pollinators; and (2) reduce storm water runoff and erosion at the solar site. Provides that an owner or manager of a solar site with a generating capacity of more than 40 kilowatts implementing site management practices under the Act may claim that the site is "pollinator-friendly" or provides benefits to game birds, songbirds, and pollinators only if the site adheres to guidance set forth by the pollinator friendly scorecard published by the Department of Natural Resources in consultation with stakeholders. Provides that an owner making a beneficial habitat claim shall make the solar site's pollinator score card, and where available, related vegetation management plans, available to the public and provide a copy to the Department of Natural Resources and a nonprofit solar industry trade association of the State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOLAR SITE-POLLINATOR FRIENDLY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Barickman
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback