IL SB3213 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that, for purposes of treatment in the early stages of a mental health condition, a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed shall provide coverage for the treatment of serious mental illnesses and serious emotional disturbances. Provides that coverage shall include, but not be limited to, certain evidence-based and evidence-informed bundled treatment approaches. Provides that payment for the services performed under the treatment models shall be based on all the components of the treatment model combined, rather than for each separate service. Provides that disability or functional impairment shall not be a precondition to receive treatment under the provisions. Provides that if federal regulations require the State to defray the cost of coverage for serious mental illnesses or serious emotional disturbances, then the provisions are inoperative and the State shall not assume any obligation for the cost of the coverage. Makes conforming changes in the State Employee Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Fair Insurance Coverage for Early Treatment of Serious Mental Health Conditions Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-SERIOUS MENTAL ILLNESS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Insurance
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.3fAmended CodeCitation Text
2151255-3Amended CodeCitation Text
2151304003Amended CodeCitation Text
21516510Amended CodeCitation Text
2155356z.29New CodeSee Bill Text
53756.11Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1069.3Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-4-2.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback