IL SB3212 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that nothing in the Act prohibits the disclosure of information by officials of a county or municipality involving reports of damaged property or the owners of damaged property if that disclosure is made to a township or county assessment official in connection with the natural disaster credit. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Repeals a Section providing that nothing in the Act prohibits the disclosure of information by officials of a county or municipality involving reports of damaged property or the owners of damaged property if that disclosure is made to a township or county assessment official in connection with the natural disaster income tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISASTER TAX CREDIT-REPORTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Revenue; 006-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355226Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.6Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback