IL SB3212 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the definition of "taxing district".
Title
INC TX-CONTAMINATED PROPERTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-01-03 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Postponed Revenue |
2013-01-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2013-01-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - January 2, 2013 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-12-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-006-001 |
2012-12-05 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2012-11-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-11-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-11-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-11-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-000-000 |
2012-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-11-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-11-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-11-09 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2013 |
2012-11-08 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2012-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2012-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-018-000 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Clayborne |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Amendment - Prevailed |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 007-001-002 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 1-150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |