IL SB3211 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Deaf and Hard of Hearing Commission Act. Provides that the Deaf and Hard of Hearing Commission shall be composed of 11 Commissioners (currently, members) that are appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate. Requires at least 7 (currently, 6) commissioners of the Commission to be people who are deaf, deafblind, or hard of hearing. Specifies the membership of the Commission. Modifies the qualifications and duties of the Director of the Commission. Provides that the added Director qualifications shall apply to anyone who becomes Director on or after the effective date of this amendatory Act. Establishes the Director as the chief executive officer of the Commission. Modifies a Section concerning the powers and duties of the Commission. Creates separate provisions specifying the powers of the Commission. Authorizes the Commission to make specified grants, bequests, agreements, and contracts. Defines "commissioner".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEAF & HARD HEARING COMMISSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20393210Amended CodeCitation Text
20393215Amended CodeCitation Text
20393220Amended CodeCitation Text
20393225Amended CodeCitation Text
20393225.5New CodeSee Bill Text
20393235New CodeSee Bill Text
20393240New CodeSee Bill Text
2039325Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback