IL SB3210 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the State Law Enforcement Privacy Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of the bill, government agencies shall remove publicly available content indicating a State law enforcement officer's residence address or county of residence. Provides that after the government agency has removed the State law enforcement officer's residence address and county of residence from publicly available content, the agency shall not publicly post or display that information and the State law enforcement officer's residence address and county of residence shall be exempt from the Freedom of Information Act unless the government agency has received consent from the State law enforcement officer to make that information available to the public. Provides that on and after the effective date of the bill, a person, business, or association shall remove publicly available content indicating a State law enforcement officer's residence address or county of residence. Provides that a person, business, or association shall not solicit, sell, or trade on the Internet a State law enforcement officer's residence address or county of residence information with the intent to pose an imminent and serious threat to the health and safety of the State law enforcement officer or the State law enforcement officer's immediate family. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to make corresponding changes.
Title
STATE LAW ENFORCEMENT PRIVACY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3210&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3210.htm |