IL SB3201 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois School Student Records Act. Provides that upon the discovery of a breach of security that results in the unauthorized release, disclosure, or acquisition of student information contained in a school student record, a school shall, no later than 48 hours after discovery, notify the parent of the student whose record is involved in the breach of security. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STUDENT RECORD-SECURITY BREACH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Education; 009-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105106.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback