IL SB3197 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Defines "uniform invoice" as a form created by the Secretary of State for the purpose of transporting vehicles and essential parts that does not convey or transfer ownership rights of a vehicle from one entity to another. Provides that the Secretary may use any commercially available title history service to determine the proper title designation of a motor vehicle before the issuance of a certificate of title. Provides that a licensed seller who sells, transfers, or wholesales a vehicle out of State shall mail the certificate of title to the physical business address in the requisite jurisdiction in lieu of transferring title at the time of sale. Provides that a purchaser of a vehicle who obtains a security interest in a vehicle in good faith for value takes free of any undisclosed liens unless the purchaser has notice of such liens. Provides that the Secretary may remove a franchise affiliate's lien. Provides that a registration permit for 90 (instead of 30) days may be provided for a fee of $13. Provides that electric motorcycles are subject for additional fees for electric vehicles. Provides that vanity and personalized plates may be issued to owners of electric vehicles. Provides that certain military plates may be (i) transferred, upon death of the owner, to the surviving spouse; and (ii) reclassified without a replacement fee. Provides that "established place of business" only includes a place with an outdoor lot capable of parking at least 5 vehicles or an indoor lot with space for a minimum of one vehicle to be parked in its indoor showroom. Provides that applicants for certain licenses shall disclose the full name, address, and contact information of each of the applicant's agents or legal representatives who is an Illinois resident and liable for the performance of the dealership.
Title
VEH CD-SOS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-213.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-104.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-405.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-806.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-806.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-101.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-101.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-102.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3197&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3197.htm |