IL SB3197 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Creates a homestead exemption in the amount of a reduction of $5,000 from the equalized assessed value of the property for police officers with a disability and firefighters with a disability. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-POLICE AND FIRE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2018-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-11-27HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-11-27HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
2018-11-27HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-001-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Mulroe
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-001-000
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 016-001-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-03-13SenateRe-referred to Executive
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-169.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback