IL SB3190 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Lowers the flat weight tax for Class C and D vehicles; Class VF farm trucks. Lowers the mileage weight tax for Class MD, ME, MF, and MG vehicles. Lowers the trailer flat weight tax for Class VDD, VDE, and VDG farm trailers. Lowers the flat weight trailer tax of Class TA, TB, TC, TD, and TE trailers.
Title
VEH CD-REGISTRATION FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-815 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-818 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-819 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3190&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3190.htm |