IL SB3190 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Dual Credit Quality Act. Requires a public university or community college, jointly with a high school, to grant dual credit to a student who completes a course under the Illinois Articulation Initiative General Education Core Curriculum package adopted by the public university or community college under the Illinois Articulation Initiative Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL BOARD-REPORT-RESERVES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-31HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-30HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-30HouseArrived in House
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-010-000
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-30SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-003-000
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-001-000
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Education; 011-000-000
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1102717New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback