IL SB3187 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2020 tax year, if a tax objection complaint has been filed, or when a petition filed with the Property Tax Appeal Board remains pending at the time the tax is due, the taxpayer may elect to (i) pay all of the tax due or (ii) pay the amount of tax due for the immediately preceding tax year. Contains provisions requiring the taxpayer to notify all taxing districts if the taxpayer elects to make a partial payment.
Title
PROP TX-PARTIAL PAYMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 16-160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-387 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 23-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 23-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 23-7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3187&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3187.htm |