IL SB3185 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Grant Accountability and Transparency Act. Modifies a Section concerning the adoption of federal rules applicable to grants and provides that specified provisions do not apply to for-profit subrecipients because for-profit subrecipients are not subject to the requirements of a specified provision of the Code of Federal Regulations. Provides that if a Program Audit Guide is not available, the State awarding agency must prepare a Program Audit Guide in accordance with the audit requirements of specified provisions of the Code of Federal Regulations. Requires the Governor's Office of Management and Budget to adopt supplemental rules pertaining to, among other subjects, specific conditions for individual recipients, including (rather than requiring) the use of a fiscal agent and additional corrective conditions. Applies provisions in the Code of Federal Regulations concerning federal agencies that make federal awards to non-federal entities to State grant-making agencies under the Act. Provides that the Grant Accountability and Transparency Unit shall be responsible for providing technical assistance and assuring the Administrative Code proposed by State grant agencies comply with the Act. Repeals the Section specifying a repeal date for the Act. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-ST AGENCY GRANT MAKING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-04-04SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30708100Repealed CodeCitation Text
3070820Amended CodeCitation Text
3070825Amended CodeCitation Text
3070845Amended CodeCitation Text
3070860Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback