IL SB3179 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Adds additional duties for the Inspector General for the Department of Human Services. Defines "substantiated" to mean that there is clear and convincing evidence (rather than a preponderance) to support the allegation of abuse, neglect, or financial exploitation. Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Defines "nurse-training". Changes the criteria for non-licensed authorized direct care staff. Provides that within one year after the bill's effective date, the Department shall prepare a report that identifies any efficiencies or improvements in Department operations, the oversight of agencies, and the reduction or elimination of duplicative activities. The report shall include a quality assessment of the feasibility of combining the functions of the Division of Developmental Disabilities' Bureau of Quality Management and the Department's Bureau of Accreditation, Licensure, and Certification. Upon the report's completion, the Department shall post the report on the Department's website and submit it to the General Assembly and Governor. Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that using contemporary data gathered on reports of allegations of abuse, neglect, and financial exploitation, the Department shall establish a process by which the Department requires responses from agencies that annually report a number of allegations that are 2 or more standard deviations from the mean for all agencies. Provides that if an agency has documented evidence and has determined that the agency cannot adequately staff a community-integrated living arrangement, then the agency may take immediate steps to close the community-integrated living arrangement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS&CILA-SERVICES-DEV DISABLED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-004-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-17HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Murphy
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 010-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2013051-17Amended CodeCitation Text
20170515.4Amended CodeCitation Text
20170518.8New CodeSee Bill Text
2101354Amended CodeCitation Text
2101359.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback