IL SB3178 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1008
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1008
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Rivers of Illinois Coordinating Council Act. Provides for the codification of the Rivers of Illinois Coordinating Council. Provides that the Council is the successor to: (i) the Illinois River Coordinating Council; (ii) the Mississippi River Coordinating Council; and (iii) the Wabash and Ohio River Coordinating Council. Provides for the consolidation and transfer of powers to the Council. Establishes the Rivers of Illinois Coordinating Council as consisting of 20 voting members to be appointed by the Governor. Specifies the membership of the Council. Provides for membership terms and meetings. Provides that the Office of the Lieutenant Governor shall be responsible for the operations of the Council, including, without limitation, funding and oversight of the Council's activities. Provides that members of the Council shall serve without compensation, but the Office of the Lieutenant Governor may reimburse members of the Council for travel expenses. Provides for duties of the Council and duties of State agencies represented on the Council. Repeals the Illinois River Watershed Restoration Act, the Mississippi River Coordinating Council Act, and the Wabash and Ohio Rivers Coordinating Council Act.
Title
RIVERS OF IL COORD COUNCIL ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1008 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 028-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-02-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3967 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4003 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4060 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |