IL SB3174 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Oil and Gas Act. Provides that wells with horizontal or directional extensions from a vertical bore hole shall not be classified as confidential. Provides that the length and direction of these wells shall be included in the Department of Natural Resources' weekly permit logs. Provides that all chemicals used during drilling and completion of these wells shall be contained in specified publications. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OIL & GAS-WELL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2018-11-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 020-000-000
2018-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-11-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-11-26HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-11-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-11-20HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseTo Petroleum Regulation Subcommittee
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-09HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 032-017-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-17SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 006-002-000
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22572512.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback