IL SB3164 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that in imposing a sentence of imprisonment or periodic imprisonment for an offense for which a sentence of probation or conditional discharge is an available sentence, if the defendant has no prior sentence of probation or conditional discharge and no prior conviction for a violent crime, the defendant shall not be sentenced to imprisonment before review and consideration of a presentence report and determination and explanation of why the particular evidence, information, factor in aggravation, factual finding, or other reasons support a sentencing determination that one or more of specified statutory aggravating factors apply and that probation or conditional discharge is not an appropriate sentence. Provides that the Sentencing Policy Advisory Council shall publish a report on the trends in sentencing for these offenders, the impact of the trends on the prison and probation populations, and any changes in the racial composition of the prison and probation populations that can be attributed to the changes made to sentencing by the amendatory Act.
Title
CD CORR-PRESENTENCE REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0861 |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-028-000 |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-04-29 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Special Committee on Restorative Justice; 008-000-000 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Restorative Justice |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Restorative Justice |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-4-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |