IL SB3161 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that the Legislative Ethics Commission shall consist of 12 commissioners (currently, 8). Provides for the appointment of and requirements for members of the general public as commissioners. Provides that a person is not eligible to serve as a commissioner if that person, among other restrictions, was registered as a lobbyist within the preceding 10 years (currently, preceding 12 months) or is someone other than a member of the General Assembly who holds a partisan elected or political party office, or is an officer or employee of a political committee or political campaign. Provides that the minutes of meetings of the Legislative Ethics Commission shall become public on the Commission's website within 5 days after the Commission's approval. Provides that the Legislative Ethics Commission shall diligently search out qualified candidates for Legislative Inspector General and shall make recommendations to the General Assembly using a specified process. Provides that within 10 days of a vacancy or of the resignation of a Legislative Inspector General, the Commission shall designate an Acting Legislative Inspector General who shall serve until the vacancy is filled. Provides that if the Office of Legislative Inspector General is vacant for 6 months or more, all complaints for which the Legislative Inspector General would be responsible shall be directed to the Executive Inspector General for the Attorney General, and he or she shall have the authority to act as provided in specified provisions of the Act. Provides that if the Office is vacant, either the staff of the Office of the Inspector General or if there is no staff of the Office of the Inspector General, the Executive Director of the Legislative Ethics Commission shall, at each meeting of the Legislative Ethics Commission, report to the Commission, how many investigations are open and not yet completed and how many complaints or allegations have been submitted during the time of the vacancy. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS-LEGIS ETHICS COMMISSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateChief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
543025-10Amended CodeCitation Text
543025-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback