IL SB3160 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Creates a uniform statement of economic interest form that must be completed by all persons who are required to file that form under the Act. Changes the nature of the required disclosures that must be made. Authorizes the Secretary of State to institute an electronic statement of economic interest filing system. Repeals a provision that established a separate form for persons required to file a statement of economic interests with county clerks. Provides applicability clause. Defines terms. Effective January 1, 2019, except that specified Sections take effect immediately.
Title
ECONOMIC INTEREST STATEMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 170 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 1-102.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-104.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-104.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-104.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 1-112.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-113.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-113.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-104 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3160&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3160.htm |