IL SB3159 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that a commissioner of the Legislative Ethics Commission who is a member of the General Assembly must recuse himself or herself from participating in any matter relating to any investigation or proceeding in which he or she is the subject, is a witness, or is a complainant (currently, is only the subject of). Requires a temporary vacancy and appointment if a commissioner who is a member of the General Assembly is required to recuse himself or herself from participating in a matter. Provides that the jurisdiction of the Commission is limited to matters arising under the Act and the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act (currently, only arising under the Act). Requires the Commission to designate an Acting Legislative Inspector General for a vacant Legislative Inspector General Office no later than the 30th day after the occurrence of the vacancy. Provides that if an ultimate jurisdictional authority fails to respond to an investigation summary report within 20 days, on the 21st day, the Legislative Inspector General may proceed under the Act as if a response had been received. Provides that if an ultimate jurisdictional authority is the subject of an investigation summary report, the Legislative Inspector General shall submit the summary report and supporting documents to the Attorney General. Provides that any complaint based on an investigation of information provided to the Office of the Legislative Inspector General or the Legislative Ethics Commission during the period from December 1, 2014 through November 3, 2017 must be filed with the Commission no later than May 17, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LEGISLATIVE ETHICS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateChief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
543025-10Amended CodeCitation Text
543025-5Amended CodeCitation Text
543025-50Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback