IL SB3158 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that beginning July 1, 2018, the appropriations available for the Executive Ethics Commission, the Offices of the Executive Inspectors General, the Legislative Ethics Commission, and the Office of the Legislative Inspector General from all State funds for each State fiscal year shall be no less than the appropriations made available for each of those agencies for the immediately preceding fiscal year. Provides that if for any reason the appropriations made available are insufficient for these purposes that the appropriations shall constitute continuing appropriations of all amounts necessary for these purposes. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BUDGET LAW-APPROPRIATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Appropriations II
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateChief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152050-22Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback