IL SB3157 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0831
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0831
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Stalking No Contact Order Act. Provides that when a petition for an emergency stalking no contact order is filed, the petition and file shall not be public and shall only be accessible to the court, law enforcement, petitioner, victim advocate, counsel of record for either party, and the State's Attorney for the county until the petition is served on the respondent. Provides that when a petition for an emergency stalking no contact order is granted, the petition, order, and file shall not be public and shall only be accessible to the court, law enforcement, petitioner, victim advocate, counsel of record for either party, and the State's Attorney for the county until the order is served on the respondent. Amends the Civil No Contact Order Act. Provides that when a petition for an emergency civil no contact order is filed, the petition and file shall not be public and shall only be accessible to the court, law enforcement, petitioner, rape crisis advocate, counsel of record for either party, and the State's Attorney for the county until the petition is served on the respondent. Provides that when a petition for a civil no contact order is granted, the petition and file shall not be public and shall only be accessible to the court, law enforcement, petitioner, rape crisis advocate, counsel of record for either party, and the State's Attorney for the county until the petition is served on the respondent. Amends the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986. Provides that when a petition for an emergency order of protection is granted, the order and file shall not be public and shall only be accessible to the court, petitioner, law enforcement, domestic violence advocate or counselor, counsel of record for either party, and the State's Attorney for the county until the order is served on the respondent. Effective immediately.
Title
NO CONTACT/PROTECTION ORDERS
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Sen. Steve McClure [R] | Sen. John Curran [R] |
Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Jackie Haas [R] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
Rep. Mark Luft [R] | Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] | Rep. Paul Jacobs [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0831 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001 |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 21 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 21 | 95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 22 | 202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 22 | 213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 22 | 214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 60 | 217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |