IL SB3156 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Enforcement Title of the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency shall cause investigations to be made as a result of the Agency's own investigation or knowledge. Provides that in all cases in which an alleged violation may have a continuing effect on the environment, the Agency shall promptly notify the Attorney General and the State's Attorney for the county in which the alleged violation is occurring. Provides that in all cases the Agency shall refer to the Attorney General and the State's Attorney of the county in which the alleged violation occurred information regarding the violation if a violation is continuing to occur or a penalty for past violations may be appropriate. Makes corresponding and other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-ENFORCEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-004-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 017-002-000
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Aquino
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2018-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415530Amended CodeCitation Text
415531Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback