IL SB3156 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Data Security on State Computers Act. Requires overwriting of data on State electronic data processing equipment at least 3 times (now, at least 10 times) before the equipment is sold, donated, transferred, or relinquished. Effective immediately.
Title
CMS-COMPUTER DATA SECURITY
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3156&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3156.htm |