IL SB3148 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Increases the fee for a restricted driving permit from $8 to $12, which shall be imposed annually until the expiration of the permit. Provides that a restricted driving permit shall expire no later than 2 years (rather than within one year) from the date of issuance. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-SOS-RESTRICTED PERMIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-003-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62556-108Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-118Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-201Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-205Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-206Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback