IL SB3148 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0803
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0803
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Increases the fee for a restricted driving permit from $8 to $12, which shall be imposed annually until the expiration of the permit. Provides that a restricted driving permit shall expire no later than 2 years (rather than within one year) from the date of issuance. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
VEH CD-SOS-RESTRICTED PERMIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0803 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-003-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |