IL SB3146 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0828
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0828
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Further amends the One Day Rest In Seven Act. Provides that an employee who works in excess of 7 1/2 continuous hours shall be entitled to an additional 20-minute meal period for every additional 4 1/2 continuous hours worked. Provides that every employer covered by the Act shall post and keep posted, in one or more conspicuous places on the premises of the employer where notices to employees are customarily posted, a notice, to be provided by the Director of Labor, summarizing the requirements of the Act and information pertaining to the filing of a complaint. Provides that the Director of Labor shall provide copies of summaries and rules to employers upon request without charge. Provides that an employer with employees who do not regularly report to a physical workplace, and instead work remotely or travel for work, shall also provide the notice by email to its employees or on a website, regularly used by the employer to communicate work-related information, that all employees are able to regularly access, freely and without interference. Changes references from "calendar week" to "consecutive seven-day period".
Title
ONE DAY OF REST-PENALTIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0828 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-044-001 |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-011-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 034-015-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 24, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Villanueva |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 016-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 014-004-000 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |