IL SB3144 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that provisions concerning the Capital Development Board Revolving Fund are repealed on July 1, 2022 (currently, July 1, 2018). Amends the General Obligation Bond Act. Provides that federal funds received as a reimbursement for a capital facilities project for which moneys from the Capital Development Fund have been expended shall remain in the Capital Development Board Contributory Trust Fund (currently, those moneys are deposited into the General Obligation Bond Retirement and Interest Fund). Amends the Capital Development Bond Act of 1972. Provides that federal funds received as a reimbursement for a capital improvement project for which moneys from the Capital Development Fund have been expended shall remain in the Capital Development Board Contributory Trust Fund (currently, those moneys are deposited into the Capital Development Bond Retirement and Interest Fund). Amends the School Construction Law. Provides that the Capital Development Board is authorized to make grants to school districts for school construction projects with funds appropriated from the School Construction Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CAP DEVELOPMENT BD-PROJECTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-04-04SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1052305-10Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.857Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-100Amended CodeCitation Text
3033015Amended CodeCitation Text
304209aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback