IL SB3143 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. In provisions requiring the Department of Central Management Services to submit an annual report regarding installment purchases or lease purchases of buildings, land, or facilities, provides that the report shall also contain an analysis of all leases that meet both of the following criteria: (1) the lease contains a purchase option clause; and (2) the third full year of the lease has been completed. Provides that the analysis shall include a recommendation of whether it is in the State's best interest to exercise the purchase option or to seek to renew the lease without exercising the clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CMS-LEASES WITH PURCHASE OPT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-04-04SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 009-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20405405-300Amended CodeCitation Text
2040567.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback