IL SB3143 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. In provisions requiring the Department of Central Management Services to submit an annual report regarding installment purchases or lease purchases of buildings, land, or facilities, provides that the report shall also contain an analysis of all leases that meet both of the following criteria: (1) the lease contains a purchase option clause; and (2) the third full year of the lease has been completed. Provides that the analysis shall include a recommendation of whether it is in the State's best interest to exercise the purchase option or to seek to renew the lease without exercising the clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CMS-LEASES WITH PURCHASE OPT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-04-04SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 009-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20405405-300Amended CodeCitation Text
2040567.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback