IL SB3142 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Auction License Act, the Home Inspector License Act, and the Real Estate Appraiser Licensing Act of 2002. Makes changes to the deadlines for completion of continuing education for renewal of a license. Amends the Real Estate License Act of 2000. In the definitions of "broker" and "person", includes an entity, corporation, foreign or domestic partnership, or other business entity. Makes conforming changes throughout the Act. Makes changes in provisions concerning licensing requirements for ownership. Makes changes to the deadline for completion of continuing education for renewal of a managing broker, broker, leasing agent, or instructor license. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REAL ESTATE LICENSES-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22540710-30Amended CodeCitation Text
2254415-30Amended CodeCitation Text
2254541-10Amended CodeCitation Text
22545410-15Amended CodeCitation Text
22545410-20Amended CodeCitation Text
22545420-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-50Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-70Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-80Amended CodeCitation Text
22545815-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2254585-45Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback