IL SB3142 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Auction License Act, the Home Inspector License Act, and the Real Estate Appraiser Licensing Act of 2002. Makes changes to the deadlines for completion of continuing education for renewal of a license. Amends the Real Estate License Act of 2000. In the definitions of "broker" and "person", includes an entity, corporation, foreign or domestic partnership, or other business entity. Makes conforming changes throughout the Act. Makes changes in provisions concerning licensing requirements for ownership. Makes changes to the deadline for completion of continuing education for renewal of a managing broker, broker, leasing agent, or instructor license. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
REAL ESTATE LICENSES-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 407 | 10-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 441 | 5-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 10-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 10-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 20-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 5-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 5-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 5-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 458 | 15-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 458 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3142&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3142.htm |