IL SB3141 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0940
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Cigarette Tax Act, and the Cigarette Use Tax Act. Provides that a taxpayer is prohibited from introducing into evidence in a proceeding before the Department of Revenue, Tax Tribunal, or court any books or records that the taxpayer failed to produce to the Department for examination, unless the books and records are received by the Department no less than 5 business days prior to seeking introduction of the books and records in the proceeding. Sets forth penalties for failure to keep or produce certain books and records. Requires distributors and secondary distributors who purchase cigarettes for shipment into Illinois from a point outside this State to make the invoices available for inspection upon demand by a duly authorized employee of the Department. Provides that the Department may assess taxes, penalties, and interest on original packages of cigarettes that do not contain property tax stamps. Provides that, if a person fails to produce records for inspection by the Department upon request, a prima facie presumption shall arise that the person has failed to keep the records so required. Provides that the sale of individual or loose cigarettes is prohibited. Amends the Tobacco Products Tax Act of 1995 to make changes concerning penalties for failure to keep and produce books and records. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

USE/OCC/CIG TX-BOOKS & RECORDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0940
2018-08-17SenateEffective Date August 17, 2018
2018-08-17SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-035-001
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-000-000
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-09HouseArrived in House
2018-05-09SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConnaughay
2018-05-09SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3510511Amended CodeCitation Text
3511011Amended CodeCitation Text
3511511Amended CodeCitation Text
351207Amended CodeCitation Text
3513012Amended CodeCitation Text
3513013Amended CodeCitation Text
3513013aNew CodeSee Bill Text
3513014Amended CodeCitation Text
3513015Amended CodeCitation Text
3513015aNew CodeSee Bill Text
3513018bAmended CodeCitation Text
3513018cAmended CodeCitation Text
3513018dNew CodeSee Bill Text
3513512Amended CodeCitation Text
3513522Amended CodeCitation Text
3513523Amended CodeCitation Text
3513523aNew CodeSee Bill Text
3513525aAmended CodeCitation Text
3513525bAmended CodeCitation Text
3513525cNew CodeSee Bill Text
351358aNew CodeSee Bill Text
3514310-25Amended CodeCitation Text
3514310-35Amended CodeCitation Text
3514310-35aNew CodeSee Bill Text
3514310-36Repealed CodeCitation Text
3514310-37Amended CodeCitation Text
3514310-38New CodeSee Bill Text
3514310-40Amended CodeCitation Text
3514310-50Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3141&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3141.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3141eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3141enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0940.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3141sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3141ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3141_05092018_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3141_05302018_043000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3141ham001_05312018_061000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback