IL SB3139 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Plain Language Task Force Act. Provides for plain language State government communications to the public. Modifies the definition of "plain language" to conform to the Plain Writing Act of 2010. Removes the representation interest requirements for persons appointed to the Task Force by the governor. Modifies the duties of the Task Force concerning the Task Force's initial report. Requires the Task Force to be specifically guided in its discussions on the subject of plain language by the Plain Writing Act of 2010 and subsequent guidance documents, including, but not limited to, the Federal Plain Language Guidelines. Modifies the purpose of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PLAIN LANGUAGE TASK FORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-001-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-001-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-05-28HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-09HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-007-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Government Reform; 007-002-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - Government Reform
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Government Reform
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Government Reform
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Government Reform
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-22SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20409010Amended CodeCitation Text
20409015Amended CodeCitation Text
20409020Amended CodeCitation Text
20409025Amended CodeCitation Text
20409030New CodeSee Bill Text
2040905Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3139&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3139.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3139eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3139enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3139sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3139sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3139ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3139ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3139ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3139_04232018_031000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3139_05302018_017000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3139ham003_05312018_059001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3139ham001_05312018_059000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback