IL SB3139 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Plain Language Task Force Act. Provides for plain language State government communications to the public. Modifies the definition of "plain language" to conform to the Plain Writing Act of 2010. Removes the representation interest requirements for persons appointed to the Task Force by the governor. Modifies the duties of the Task Force concerning the Task Force's initial report. Requires the Task Force to be specifically guided in its discussions on the subject of plain language by the Plain Writing Act of 2010 and subsequent guidance documents, including, but not limited to, the Federal Plain Language Guidelines. Modifies the purpose of the Act.
Title
PLAIN LANGUAGE TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1108 |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date August 27, 2018 |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-001-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-001-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-05-28 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-007-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Government Reform; 007-002-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Postponed - Government Reform |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Government Reform |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Government Reform |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Government Reform |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Government Reform |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 4090 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4090 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4090 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4090 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4090 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 4090 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |