IL SB3138 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0887
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Provides that the identity and address of a scholarship, grant, or financial assistance applicant or recipient under the Act is private information and is exempt from inspection and copying under the Freedom of Information Act. Makes conforming changes in the Freedom of Information Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-IDENTITY-PRIVATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0887
2018-08-14SenateEffective Date August 14, 2018
2018-08-14SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-26SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bennett
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-002-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11094770Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback