IL SB3135 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Certified Community Behavioral Health Clinics Act. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall provide grants to certified community behavioral health clinics that have been selected to participate in the Department's demonstration programs with the United States Department of Health and Human Services. Provides that grants awarded by the Department shall be used for expenses related to identifying, planning, preparing for, and implementing plans and operations in accordance with State and federal certification criteria. Provides that each recipient of a grant shall be eligible for up to $1,500,000 for each certified community behavioral health clinic operated by the recipient and approved by the Department. Provides that the Department shall prescribe the form and manner of application for a grant. Provides that the Department may adopt any rules necessary to implement the provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH-BEHAVIORAL CLINIC GRANT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3135&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3135.htm |