IL SB3134 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Flood Control Act of 1945. Creates the Flood Control Commission. Provides that the Commission shall study current flood control practices within the counties of DuPage, Kane, Lake, McHenry, and Will. Adds provisions concerning the membership and duties of the Commission. Provides that the Commission shall conduct a survey of the 5 counties and submit a report of the survey, including specific information, to the General Assembly by December 31, 2019. Repeals the new provisions on January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FLOOD CONTROL COMMISSION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 005-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 005-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
615158.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3134&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3134.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3134eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3134enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3134ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3134ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3134_04232018_030000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3134_05282018_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3134ham002_05312018_030001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3134ham001_05312018_030000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback