IL SB3131 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Changes references to "hearing examiner" to references to "administrative law judge" throughout the Act. Repeals provisions concerning emission allowances, conducting a study on billing practices and policies, conducting a study on strategic options for changing the structure of energy service markets, conducting a study on the feasibility of wheeling electricity in the State, rules for recovering costs of canceled facilities, recovery of additional charges refunded to customers, conducting a study on implementing promotional rates for industrial and commercial customers, alternative rate regulations, and conducting a study on patterns of entry and exit for each relevant market for telecommunications services. Removes references to repealed provisions. Makes conforming changes in the High Speed Internet Services and Information Technology Act. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITIES-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 008-000-000
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2066120Amended CodeCitation Text
220510-101Amended CodeCitation Text
220510-101.1Amended CodeCitation Text
220510-103Amended CodeCitation Text
220510-104Amended CodeCitation Text
220510-105Amended CodeCitation Text
220510-106Amended CodeCitation Text
220510-107Amended CodeCitation Text
220510-110Amended CodeCitation Text
220510-111Amended CodeCitation Text
220510-201Amended CodeCitation Text
220510-204Amended CodeCitation Text
220513-407Repealed CodeCitation Text
220513-506.2Amended CodeCitation Text
220513-515Amended CodeCitation Text
220516-108.5Amended CodeCitation Text
220516-111Amended CodeCitation Text
22052-105Amended CodeCitation Text
22052-106Amended CodeCitation Text
22054-304Amended CodeCitation Text
22054-305Repealed CodeCitation Text
22055-102Amended CodeCitation Text
22056-102Amended CodeCitation Text
22057-204Amended CodeCitation Text
22058-103BAmended CodeCitation Text
22058-304Repealed CodeCitation Text
22058-405Repealed CodeCitation Text
22058-405.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
22058-508Amended CodeCitation Text
22058-509Amended CodeCitation Text
22059-102.1Amended CodeCitation Text
22059-201Amended CodeCitation Text
22059-214Amended CodeCitation Text
22059-216Repealed CodeCitation Text
22059-222.2Amended CodeCitation Text
22059-222.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
22059-223Amended CodeCitation Text
22059-242Repealed CodeCitation Text
22059-244Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback