IL SB3131 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that upon application by a facility, the Director of Public Health may grant or renew a waiver of certain staffing requirements for registered nurses, considering specified criteria, if the facility demonstrates to the Director's satisfaction that the facility is unable, despite diligent efforts, including offering wages at a competitive rate for registered nurses in the community, to employ the required number of registered nurses. Provides that the Director may not grant or renew such waivers for certain minimum nurse staffing requirements contained in federal regulations to facilities that are Medicare-certified or both Medicare-certified and Medicaid-certified. Provides that these waivers shall be reviewed quarterly by the Department of Public Health, including requiring a demonstration by the facility that it has continued to make diligent efforts to employ the required number of registered nurses, and shall be revoked for noncompliance with certain requirements. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NURSING HOME-STAFFING-NURSES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2016-11-29HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2016-11-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2016-11-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-008-000
2016-11-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2016-11-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2016-11-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2016-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2016-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2016-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2016-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2016-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2016-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2016-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2016-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2016-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2016-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2016-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2016-11-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
2016-11-14HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2016-05-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-05-03HouseFirst Reading
2016-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2016-04-21HouseArrived in House
2016-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2016-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016
2016-04-14SenateSecond Reading
2016-04-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2016-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2016-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
2016-04-06SenateDo Pass Public Health; 009-000-000
2016-03-16SenatePostponed - Public Health
2016-03-08SenateAssigned to Public Health
2016-02-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2016-02-19SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-19SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210453-303.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback