IL SB3128 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0610
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Design-Build Procurement Act. Provides that the Act is repealed on July 1, 2021 (currently, July 1, 2019). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DESIGN BUILD-EXTEND REPEAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-17SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0610
2018-07-17SenateEffective Date July 17, 2018
2018-07-17SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 050-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 050-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 050-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - May 31, 2018
2018-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-31SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-003-000
2018-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 008-000-000
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 008-000-000
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-30HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-30HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-30HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3053790Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3128&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3128.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3128eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3128enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0610.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3128ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3128ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3128ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3128_04182018_019000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3128_05312018_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3128ham003_05312018_071002C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3128ham002_05312018_071001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3128ham001_05312018_071000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback