IL SB3128 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0610
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0610
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Design-Build Procurement Act. Provides that the Act is repealed on July 1, 2021 (currently, July 1, 2019). Effective immediately.
Title
DESIGN BUILD-EXTEND REPEAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0610 |
2018-07-17 | Senate | Effective Date July 17, 2018 |
2018-07-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 050-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 050-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 050-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-003-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-30 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-05-30 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 537 | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |