IL SB3127 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1006
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1006
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various laws to include emergency medical dispatchers in references to first responders.
Title
EMERGENCY MEDICAL DISPATCHERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1006 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities |
2022-03-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-02-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 128 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 22-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2310 | 2310-256 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 53 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 705 | 5-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 490 | 148 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 648 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 168 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 310 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |