IL SB3127 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - November 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Obligation Bond Act. Provides that the unused portion of federal funds received for or as reimbursement for a capital facilities project (currently, the unused portion of federal funds received for a capital facilities project) shall remain in the Capital Development Board Contributory Trust Fund. Removes a provision providing that any federal funds received as reimbursement for the completed construction of a capital improvement project shall be deposited in the Capital Development Bond Retirement and Interest Fund. Amends the Capital Development Bond Act of 1972. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CDB-FEDERAL FUNDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - November 28, 2018
2018-11-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-11-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-004-000
2018-11-28House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-11-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-11-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-11-14HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-004-000
2018-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-11-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-11-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-04-04SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3033015Amended CodeCitation Text
304209aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback